|
06/12/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 764.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/06.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 06/05.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 64, nays 18. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 52, nays 13. The House refused to adopt the Conference Committee Report. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 2 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
House conferees appointed: Brossett, Arnold, and Kleckley.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Peterson, and Smith, Gary.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/26/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 6 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 16 nays.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|