|
06/12/2012
|
Effective date 6/12/12.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 765.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/06.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 82, nays 5. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2012.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
House conferees appointed: Ligi, Tim Burns, and Leger.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Appel, and Donahue.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 10. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|