|
06/01/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 35. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 34. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/24/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Reported without amendments (10-1-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Reported favorably (12-6) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|