SLS 12RS-551 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 5 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2012 SENATE BILL NO. 302 BY SENATOR PEACOCK TAX/INCOME/CORPORATE. Phases down the highest corporate income tax rates (5% to 8%) to 4% over a four-year period starting for tax years beginning in 2013. (gov sig) AN ACT1 To amend and reenact R.S. 47:32(C) and 287.12, relative to income tax; to reduce corporate2 income tax rates; and to provide for related matters.3 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:4 Section 1. R.S. 47:32(C) and 287.12 are hereby amended and reenacted to read as5 follows: 6 §32. Rates of tax7 * * *8 C. On corporations. The tax to be assessed, levied, collected, and paid upon9 the net income of every corporation shall be computed at the rate of: 10 (1) Four percentum upon the first twenty-five thousand dollars of net income.11 (2)(a) For tax years beginning on or before December 31, 2012, five12 percentum percent upon the amount of net income above twenty-five thousand13 dollars but not in excess of fifty thousand dollars.14 (b) For tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2013, four percent15 upon such net income.16 (3)(a) For tax years beginning on or before December 31, 2012, six17 SB NO. 302 SLS 12RS-551 ORIGINAL Page 2 of 5 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. percentum percent on the amount of net income above fifty thousand dollars but not1 in excess of one hundred thousand dollars.2 (b) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2013, five percent on3 such net income.4 (c) For tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2014, four percent5 on such net income.6 (4)(a) For tax years beginning on or before December 31, 2012, seven7 percentum percent on the amount of net income above one hundred thousand dollars8 but not in excess of two hundred thousand dollars.9 (b) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2013, six percent on10 such net income.11 (c) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2014, five percent on12 such net income.13 (d) For tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2015, four percent14 on such net income.15 (5)(a) For tax years beginning on or before December 31, 2012, eight16 percentum percent on all net income in excess of two hundred thousand dollars.17 (b) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2013, seven percent on18 such net income.19 (c) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2014, six percent on20 such net income.21 (d) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2015, five percent on22 such net income.23 (6) For tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2016, the tax rate24 shall be four percent on all net income.25 * * *26 §287.12. Rates of tax27 The tax to be assessed, levied, collected, and paid upon the Louisiana taxable28 income of every corporation shall be computed at the rate of:29 SB NO. 302 SLS 12RS-551 ORIGINAL Page 3 of 5 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. (1) Four percent upon the first twenty-five thousand dollars of Louisiana1 taxable income.2 (2)(a) For tax years beginning on or before December 31, 2012, five3 percent upon the amount of Louisiana taxable income above twenty-five thousand4 dollars but not in excess of fifty thousand dollars.5 (b) For tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2013, four percent6 upon such income.7 (3)(a) For tax years beginning on or before December 31, 2012, six8 percent on the amount of Louisiana taxable income above fifty thousand dollars but9 not in excess of one hundred thousand dollars.10 (b) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2013, five percent on11 such income.12 (c) For tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2014, four percent13 on such income.14 (4)(a) For tax years beginning on or before December 31, 2012, seven15 percent on the amount of Louisiana taxable income above one hundred thousand16 dollars but not in excess of two hundred thousand dollars.17 (b) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2013, six percent on18 such income.19 (c) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2014, five percent on20 such income.21 (d) For tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2015, four percent22 on such income.23 (5)(a) For tax years beginning on or before December 31, 2012, eight24 percent on all Louisiana taxable income in excess of two hundred thousand dollars.25 (b) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2013, seven percent on26 such income.27 (c) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2014, six percent on28 such income.29 SB NO. 302 SLS 12RS-551 ORIGINAL Page 4 of 5 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. (d) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2015, five percent on1 such income.2 (6) For tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2016, the tax rate3 shall be four percent on all Louisiana taxable income.4 Section 2. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not5 signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature6 by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana. If7 vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become8 effective on the day following such approval.9 The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Riley Boudreaux. DIGEST Present law levies a tax on corporations at the following rates: 1. 4% on the first $25,000 of net income. 2. 5% on the amount above $25,000 to $50,000. 3. 6% on the amount above $50,000 to $100,000. 4. 7% on the amount above $100,000 to $200,000. 5. 8% on all net income above $200,000. Proposed law phases-down all the rates above 4% over a four-year period starting for tax years beginning in 2013, so that all income is taxed at the 4% rate, as follows: 1. The 5% rate is phased down to 4% for tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2013. 2. The 6% rate is phased down: For tax years beginning during calendar year 2013, 5.0%. For tax years beginning on and after Jan. 1, 2014, 4.0%. 3. The 7% rate is phased down: For tax years beginning during calendar year 2013, 6.0%. For tax years beginning during calendar year 2014, 5.0%. For tax years beginning on and after Jan. 1, 2015, 4.0%. 4. The 8% rate is phased down: For tax years beginning during calendar year 2013, 7.0%. For tax years beginning during calendar year 2014, 6.0%. For tax years beginning during calendar year 2015, 5.0%. For tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2016, the tax rate is 4% on all Louisiana taxable income. SB NO. 302 SLS 12RS-551 ORIGINAL Page 5 of 5 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action. (Amends R.S. 47:32(C) and 287.12)