|
06/01/2012
|
Effective date 7/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 465.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Notice Senate reconsidered and concurred in House Amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Donahue, Appel, and Murray.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Reported favorably (17-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|