|
06/15/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/6.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 06/05.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 72, nays 9. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice Senate reconsidered and recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice House recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
By a vote of 49 yeas and 38 nays, the House recommitted the report to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice House rejected the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 36, nays 36. The House refused to adopt the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 14 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
House conferees appointed: Brossett, Robideaux, and Leger.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Tarver, and Heitmeier.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 14. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported with amendments (18-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|