|
05/22/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 32, nays 59. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|