|
06/04/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor on June 5, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 5 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 39. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|