|
06/12/2012
|
Effective date 6/12/12.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 777.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|