04/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/11/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
04/11/2012 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/11/2012 | Called from the Calendar. | |||
04/10/2012 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
04/09/2012 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
04/04/2012 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/12/2012 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |||
03/01/2012 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |