|
06/01/2012
|
Notice removed.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported with amendments (10-2) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read by title and passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 13 nays; ordered re-reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
By a vote of 26 yeas and 9 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 16 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|