04/19/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |||
04/18/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
04/17/2012 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 12 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/17/2012 | Called from the Calendar. | |||
04/09/2012 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
04/09/2012 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | |||
04/03/2012 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
04/02/2012 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |||
03/12/2012 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |||
03/02/2012 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |