|
05/23/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 60. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Reported favorably (9-4) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|