05/10/2012 | Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate. | |||
05/10/2012 | Called from the Calendar. | |||
04/09/2012 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
04/09/2012 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | |||
04/03/2012 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
04/02/2012 | Reported with amendments. | |||
03/12/2012 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |||
03/02/2012 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |