|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Reported with amendments (10-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 12 nays; ordered re-reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|