|
06/13/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 793.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/06.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2012.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
House conferees appointed: Broadwater, Dixon, and Smith.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Broome, Crowe, and Murray.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|