|
06/13/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 794.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Reported favorably (9-0-1) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|