Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
04/26/2012
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
04/25/2012
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
04/24/2012
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
04/23/2012
Reported with amendments.
03/12/2012
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
03/02/2012
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.