SLS 12RS-115 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 5 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2012 SENATE BILL NO. 55 BY SENATOR GUILLORY STATE EMPLOYEE RET. Changes the system's actuarial valuation method to entry age normal. (7/1/12) AN ACT1 To amend and reenact R.S. 11:22(B)(6), and 102(B)(1) and to enact R.S. 11:102(D) and2 _____, relative to the actuarial valuation method of the Louisiana State Employees'3 Retirement System; to change such method from projected unit credit to entry age4 normal; to provide for the amortization of any gain or loss attributable to such5 change; to provide relative to employer contributions after such change; to provide6 for an effective date; and to provide for related matters.7 Notice of intention to introduce this Act has been published.8 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:9 Section 1. R.S. 11:22(B)(6), and (B)(1) are hereby amended and reenacted and R.S.10 11:102(D) is enacted to read as follows:11 §22. Methods of actuarial valuation established12 * * *13 B. The following funding methods shall be utilized to determine actuarially14 required contributions:15 * * *16 (6) Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System: projected unit credit entry age17 SB NO. 55 SLS 12RS-115 ORIGINAL Page 2 of 5 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. normal.1 * * *2 §102. Employer contributions; determination; state systems3 * * *4 , C.(1) This Subsection shall be applicable to the Louisiana State Employees'5 Retirement System effective for the June 30, 2010, system valuation and beginning6 Fiscal Year 2011-2012. For purposes of this Subsection, "plan" or "plans" shall7 mean a subgroup within the system characterized by the following employee8 classifications:9 * * *10 (j) Hazardous duty plan members as provided pursuant to R.S. 11:611 et seq.11 (k) Judges as provided pursuant to R.S. 11:62(5)(a)(iii) and 444(A)(1)(a)(ii).12 * * *13 (4)(a) For each plan referenced in Paragraph (1) of this Subsection, the14 legislature shall set the required employer contribution rate equal to the sum of the15 following:16 (a)(i) The particularized normal cost rate. The normal cost rate for each fiscal year17 shall be the employer's normal cost for the plan computed by applying the method18 specified in R.S. 11:102(B)(1) and (3)(a) to the plan.19 (b)(ii) The shared unfunded accrued liability rate. A single rate shall be computed20 for each fiscal year, applicable to all plans for actuarial changes, gains, and losses21 existing on June 30, 2010, or occurring thereafter, including experience and22 investment gains and losses, which are independent of the existence of the plans23 listed in Paragraph (1) of this Subsection, the payment and rate therefor shall be24 calculated as provided in Paragraphs (B)(1) and (3) of this Section.25 (c)(iii) The particularized unfunded accrued liability rate. For actuarial changes,26 gains, and losses, excluding experience and investment gains and losses, first27 recognized in the June 30, 2010, valuation or in any later valuation, attributable to28 one or more, but not all, plans listed in Paragraph (1) of this Subsection or to some29 SB NO. 55 SLS 12RS-115 ORIGINAL Page 3 of 5 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. new plan or plans, created, implemented, or enacted after July 1, 2010, a1 particularized contribution rate shall be calculated as provided in Paragraphs (B)(1)2 and (3) of this Section.3 (d)(iv) The shared gross employer contribution rate difference. The gross employer4 contribution rate difference shall be the difference between the minimum gross5 employer contribution rate provided in Paragraph (B)(5) of this Section and the6 aggregate employer contribution rate calculated pursuant to the provisions of7 Subsection B of this Section.8 (b) For each fiscal year beginning with Fiscal Year 2012-2013, if there9 remains a balance in the original amortization base or the experience account10 amortization base, then the employer contribution rate under Subparagraph (a)11 for the plans referenced in Paragraph (1) shall be increased by the following12 amounts:13 (i) The plan referenced in Paragraph (1)(a) 1.5%14 (ii) The plan referenced in Paragraph (1)(b) 2.0%15 (iii) The plan referenced in Paragraph (1)(c)2.0%16 (iv) The plan referenced in Paragraph (1)(d) 0.2%17 (vi) The plan referenced in Paragraph (1)(e) 0.1%18 (vi) The plan referenced in Paragraph (1)(f) 2.0%19 (vii) The plan referenced in Paragraph (1)(g)2.0%20 (viii) The plan referenced in Paragraph (1)(h)2.0%21 (ix) The plan referenced in Paragraph (1)(i) 2.0%22 (x) The plan referenced in Paragraph (1)(j) 0.0%23 (xi) The plan referenced in Paragraph (1)(k) 0.0%24 * * *25 §102.1. Consolidation of amortization payment schedules; Louisiana State26 Employees' Retirement System27 * * *28 B. Original amortization base.29 SB NO. 55 SLS 12RS-115 ORIGINAL Page 4 of 5 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. * * *1 (6) In any year in which the system receives additional contributions2 pursuant to R.S. 11:102(C)(4)(b), the amount of such additional contribution3 shall be applied to the remaining balance of the original amortization base4 established pursuant to this Subsection. If there is no remaining balance of the5 original amortization base then the additional contributions received pursuant6 to R.S. 11:102(C)(4)(b) shall be applied to the remaining balance of the7 experience account amortization base established in Subsection (C).8 C. Experience account amortization base.9 (1) The remaining balances of outstanding amortization bases for the years10 1996, 1999 through 2004, and 2008, as specified in the system valuation adopted by11 the Public Retirement Systems' Actuarial Committee on February 5, 2009, shall be12 consolidated into a single amortization base, effective for the June 30, 2009 system13 valuation with payments beginning on July 1, 2010. Notwithstanding any other14 provision of law to the contrary, any increase in liability associated with the15 change to the entry age normal actuarial funding method shall be amortized as16 a shared unfunded accrued liability and shall be added to this base. The17 payments shall then be reamortized to maintain the original term and schedule18 of payment increases pursuant to Paragraph (3) of this Subsection.19 * * *20 (6) In any year in which the system receives additional contributions21 pursuant to R.S. 11:102(C)(4)(b), the amount of such additional contribution22 shall be applied to the remaining balance of the original amortization base23 established pursuant to Subsection (B). If there is no remaining balance of the24 original amortization base then the additional contributions received pursuant25 to R.S. 11:102(C)(4)(b) shall be applied to the remaining balance of the26 experience account amortization base established in this Subsection.27 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2012; if vetoed by the28 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on29 SB NO. 55 SLS 12RS-115 ORIGINAL Page 5 of 5 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. June 30, 2012, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.1 The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Laura Gail Sullivan. DIGEST Present constitution (Art. X, Sect. 29(E)(1)) provides that the legislature shall establish, by law, the particular method of actuarial valuation to be employed by each state or statewide retirement system for purposes of attaining and maintaining the actuarial soundness of such system. Present law (R.S. 11:4(A)(1)(a)) provides that the La. State Employees' Retirement System (LASERS) is a state retirement system. Proposed law retains present law. Present law (R.S. 11:22(B)(6)) provides that LASERS' valuation method shall be projected unit credit. Proposed law changes the LASERS valuation method to entry age normal. Present law (R.S. 11:102) provides for required employer contributions to state retirement systems including LASERS. Proposed law provides that the LASERS employer contribution rate shall be the rate determined pursuant to present law plus 0.7%. Provides for accumulation and application of the additional contributions to reduce the unfunded accrued liability (UAL) of LASERS. Effective July 1, 2012. (Amends R.S. 11:22(B(6)) and 102(B)(1); adds 102(D) and _______)