|
06/07/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 670.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|