Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
05/07/2012
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
05/03/2012
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
05/02/2012
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
05/01/2012
Reported with amendments.
03/12/2012
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
03/02/2012
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.