|
06/04/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor on June 8, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/06.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 06/05.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 73, nays 12. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 52, nays 41. The House refused to adopt the Conference Committee Report. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
House conferees appointed: Leger, Dixon, and Broadwater.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Crowe, Peterson, and Murray.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 17. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Reported favorably (7-6) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|