LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB579
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB579
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB579
Action History
05/01/2012
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
04/30/2012
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
04/26/2012
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
04/24/2012
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
04/23/2012
Reported favorably.
03/12/2012
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
03/02/2012
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.