|
06/14/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 839.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|