|
05/25/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 337.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/17.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|