|
06/07/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 676.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 8. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported favorably (14-3) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|