|
05/25/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 341.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported favorably (12-0-1) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|