|
06/07/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 678.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported favorably (17-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 83. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|