|
05/04/2012
|
Effective date 5/4/12.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 36.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/26/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 163. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|