|
06/07/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 679.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|