|
05/04/2012
|
Effective date 5/4/12.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 4/24/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|