04/19/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |||
04/18/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
04/17/2012 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/17/2012 | Called from the Calendar. | |||
04/16/2012 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
04/12/2012 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
04/11/2012 | Reported favorably. | |||
04/03/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |||
04/02/2012 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |