05/15/2012 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |||
05/07/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |||
05/03/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
05/03/2012 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
05/01/2012 | Reported favorably. | |||
04/03/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |||
04/02/2012 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |