|
06/01/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 475.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/17/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|