|
06/04/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor on June 15, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|