Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
05/17/2012
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
05/16/2012
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 9 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
05/16/2012
Called from the Calendar.
05/08/2012
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
05/07/2012
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
04/03/2012
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.