05/23/2012 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |||
05/22/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |||
05/21/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
05/21/2012 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
05/21/2012 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | |||
05/15/2012 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
05/14/2012 | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
04/03/2012 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |