|
06/01/2012
|
Effective date 1/1/13.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 476.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/17/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 547. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|