LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB749
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB749
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB749
Action History
05/08/2012
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
05/07/2012
Rules suspended. Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
05/02/2012
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
04/23/2012
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
04/19/2012
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 51. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.