|
05/31/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 369.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 388. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|