|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 49. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported with amendments (11-6) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 690. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|