|
06/15/2012
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Becomes Act No. 873
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 2. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/24/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Reported without amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Reported favorably (20-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|