|
06/11/2012
|
Effective date 7/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 717.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 12. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 43. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported with amendments (8-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|