|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported favorably (18-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|