|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read by title, concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Substitute for Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 66. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|