06/04/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |||
05/30/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/30/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/29/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays. | |||
05/24/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012. | |||
05/23/2012 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/22/2012 | Reported favorably (8-0). | |||
05/15/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
05/14/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
05/10/2012 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |