06/04/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |||
06/03/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/03/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/01/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
06/01/2012 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays. | |||
05/31/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012. | |||
05/31/2012 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/30/2012 | Reported favorably (15-0). | |||
05/21/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
05/17/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
05/17/2012 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
05/16/2012 | Reported favorably. | |||
05/15/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
05/15/2012 | Rules suspended | |||
05/15/2012 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |