Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
03/21/2012
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
03/19/2012
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
03/14/2012
Received from the House without amendments.
03/13/2012
Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
03/12/2012
Received in the House from the Senate.
03/12/2012
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House.