06/04/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |||
06/04/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/04/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
06/03/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
06/03/2012 | Rules suspended. Read by title, concurred in by vote of 73 yeas, 28 nays. | |||
06/03/2012 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
06/01/2012 | Reported favorably (13-9). | |||
05/31/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |||
05/30/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
05/29/2012 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |||
05/28/2012 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
05/22/2012 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |