|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported favorably (13-0).
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|